AK SB12 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the duties of the Department of Administration; creating an address confidentiality program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Kiehl [D] | Sen. Loki Tobin [D] | Sen. Forrest Dunbar [D] | Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] |
Sen. Elvi Gray-Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-05-06 | House | FN5: (ADM) |
2024-05-06 | House | FN4: ZERO(DPS) |
2024-05-06 | House | FN3: ZERO(DPS) |
2024-05-06 | House | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2024-05-06 | House | DP: GRAY, GROH, SUMNER, ALLARD, VANCE |
2024-05-06 | House | JUD RPT HCS(STA) 5DP |
2024-03-13 | House | FN5: (ADM) |
2024-03-13 | House | FN4: ZERO(DPS) |
2024-03-13 | House | FN3: ZERO(DPS) |
2024-03-13 | House | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2024-03-13 | House | NR: WRIGHT, CARPENTER, C.JOHNSON, ALLARD |
2024-03-13 | House | DP: CARRICK, STORY, SHAW |
2024-03-13 | House | STA RPT HCS(STA) 3DP 4NR |
2023-04-26 | House | STA, JUD, FIN |
2023-04-26 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-04-24 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 12(JUD) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-04-24 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- E2 A1 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 12(JUD) |
2023-04-21 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, GRAY-JACKSON |
2023-04-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/24 CAL |
2023-04-21 | Senate | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2023-04-21 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-04-21 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/23 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): TOBIN, DUNBAR |
2023-04-03 | Senate | FN1: (ADM) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | AM: WILSON |
2023-04-03 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, MERRICK, BISHOP |
2023-04-03 | Senate | DP: OLSON, HOFFMAN, KIEHL |
2023-04-03 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 3NR 1AM |
2023-03-17 | Senate | FN1: (ADM) |
2023-03-17 | Senate | AM: KAUFMAN |
2023-03-17 | Senate | DP: CLAMAN, TOBIN, KIEHL |
2023-03-17 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 3DP 1AM NEW TITLE |
2023-03-01 | Senate | FN1: (ADM) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, BJORKMAN, MERRICK |
2023-03-01 | Senate | DP: KAWASAKI |
2023-03-01 | Senate | STA RPT CS 1DP 3NR NEW TITLE |
2023-01-18 | Senate | STA, JUD, FIN |
2023-01-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-01-18 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23 |
Subjects
Corrections
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Divorce
Domestic Violence
Law Enforcement
Minors
Postal Service
Privacy
Public Officers
Public Safety
Safety
Victims Rights
Women
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Divorce
Domestic Violence
Law Enforcement
Minors
Postal Service
Privacy
Public Officers
Public Safety
Safety
Victims Rights
Women