AK SB103 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the Alaska education innovation grant program; eliminating the Alaska education grant program; relating to the funding of and eligibility for the Alaska performance scholarship program; redesignating the Alaska higher education investment fund as the Alaska education innovation grant fund; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ed Grants/scholarship;innovative Ed Fund

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date Clauses (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03HouseREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2017-05-03HouseEDC, FIN
2017-05-03HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-26SenateVERSION: CSSB 103(FIN)
2017-04-26SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2017-04-26SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y20 N-
2017-04-26SenatePASSED Y13 N7
2017-04-26SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 103(FIN)
2017-04-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-26SenateAM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N14
2017-04-26SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-26SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-26SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2017
2017-04-15SenateFN7: (UA)
2017-04-15SenateFN6: (EED)
2017-04-15SenateFN5: (EED)
2017-04-15SenateFN4: (EED)
2017-04-14SenateNR: BISHOP, VON IMHOF, OLSON, MICCICHE
2017-04-14SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, HUGHES
2017-04-14SenateFIN RPT CS 3DP 4NR NEW TITLE
2017-04-07SenateFN3: (EED)
2017-04-07SenateFN2: (EED)
2017-04-07SenateFN1: (EED)
2017-04-07SenateNR: COGHILL
2017-04-07SenateAM: HUGHES, BEGICH, GIESSEL, STEVENS
2017-04-07SenateEDC RPT 1NR 4AM
2017-04-03SenateEDC WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
2017-04-03SenateEDC, FIN
2017-04-03SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback