AK HJR51 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting certain changes to proposed regulations to implement the Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act of 2008.
Title
Proposed Fed. Mortgage Licensing Regs
Sponsors
Rep. Wes Keller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-27 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 45 | |
2010-07-09 | 3:19 PM 6/10/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-04-14 | VERSION: HJR 51 | |
2010-04-14 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-14 | PASSED Y19 N- A1 | |
2010-04-14 | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 51 | |
2010-04-14 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-14 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-14 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2010 | |
2010-04-11 | FN1: ZERO(H.L&C) | |
2010-04-11 | NR: PASKVAN | |
2010-04-11 | DP: BUNDE, DAVIS, MEYER | |
2010-04-11 | L&C RPT 3DP 1NR | |
2010-04-01 | L&C | |
2010-04-01 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-31 | VERSION: HJR 51 | |
2010-03-31 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-03-31 | PASSED Y37 E3 | |
2010-03-31 | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 51 | |
2010-03-31 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-31 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-31 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | FN1: ZERO(H.L&C) | |
2010-03-10 | NR: BUCH | |
2010-03-10 | DP: NEUMAN, CHENAULT, OLSON | |
2010-03-10 | L&C RPT 3DP 1NR | |
2010-02-23 | L&C | |
2010-02-23 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |