AK HJR25 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - REFERRED TO RESOURCES
Pending: Senate Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ensure Access Into Denali Park

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensure Access Into Denali Park

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21SenateREFERRED TO RESOURCES
2020-02-21SenateRES
2020-02-21SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2020-02-19HouseVERSION: HJR 25
2020-02-19HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2020-02-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): PRUITT, EASTMAN, JOHNSTON, STORY, TUCK, TARR
2020-02-19HousePASSED Y37 E2 V1
2020-02-19HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HJR 25
2020-02-19HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2020-02-19HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-02-19HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/19/2020
2020-02-17HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KOPP
2020-02-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
2020-02-14HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2020-02-14HouseLINCOLN
2020-02-14HouseDP: TUCK, HANNAN, TALERICO, SPOHNHOLZ, RAUSCHER, RASMUSSEN, HOPKINS, TARR,
2020-02-14HouseRES RPT 9DP
2020-02-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS
2020-02-03HouseRES
2020-02-03HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback