AK HJR22 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/7 LEGIS RESOLVE 68
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requesting the United States Congress to call a convention of the states to propose amendments to the Constitution of the United States that impose fiscal restraints on the federal government, limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and limit the terms of office of federal government officials; and urging the legislatures of the other 49 states to request the United States Congress to call a convention of the states.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Constitutional Convention

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 4 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 4 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 4 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 9 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 9 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 9 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 9 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 8 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 8 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-11HousePERMANENTLY FILED 7/7 LEGIS RESOLVE 68
2014-07-01House2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2014-05-30HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2014-04-19SenateVERSION: HJR 22 AM
2014-04-19SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2014-04-19SenatePASSED Y12 N8
2014-04-19SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME HJR 22 AM
2014-04-19SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-19SenateAM NO 6 FAILED Y4 N16
2014-04-19SenateAM NO 5 FAILED Y4 N16
2014-04-19SenateAM NO 4 FAILED Y5 N15
2014-04-19SenateAM NO 3 FAILED Y5 N15
2014-04-19SenateAM NO 2 FAILED Y6 N14
2014-04-19SenateAM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N11
2014-04-19SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-18SenateNOT TAKEN UP 4/18 -- ON 4/19 CALENDAR
2014-04-18SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2014
2014-03-28SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2014-03-28SenateAM: WIELECHOWSKI
2014-03-28SenateNR: OLSON
2014-03-28SenateDP: COGHILL, MCGUIRE, DYSON
2014-03-28SenateJUD RPT 3DP 1NR 1AM
2014-03-19SenateFIN REFERRAL REMOVED
2014-03-14SenateJUD REFERRAL ADDED BEFORE FIN
2014-03-14SenateFIN
2014-03-14SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2014-03-12HouseVERSION: HJR 22 AM
2014-03-12HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2014-03-12HousePASSED Y24 N13 E2 A1
2014-03-12HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2014-03-12HouseAM NO 6 ADOPTED Y24 N14 E2
2014-03-12HouseAM NO 5 FAILED Y14 N21 E2 A3
2014-03-12HouseAM NO 4 FAILED Y9 N29 E2
2014-03-12HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y9 N29 E2
2014-03-12HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N29 E2
2014-03-12HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N30 E2
2014-03-12HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UNAN CONSENT
2014-03-12HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HJR 22
2014-03-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LYNN
2014-03-10HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/12 CALENDAR
2014-03-10HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-03-10HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/2014
2014-03-03HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2014-03-03HouseNR: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES, EDGMON, GARA, COSTELLO, AUSTERMAN
2014-03-03HouseDP: MUNOZ, NEUMAN, T.WILSON
2014-03-03HouseFIN RPT 3DP 6NR
2014-02-28HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ, THOMPSON
2014-02-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GATTIS, MILLETT, HUGHES, ISAACSON
2014-02-07HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2014-02-07HouseNR: KREISS-TOMKINS
2014-02-07HouseDP: MILLETT, GATTIS, KELLER, ISAACSON, HUGHES, LYNN
2014-02-07HouseSTA RPT 6DP 1NR
2014-01-21HouseSTA, FIN
2014-01-21HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=28&bill=HJR22
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HJR022A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HJR022B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HJR022Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HJR22&jrn=1856&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HJR22&jrn=1857&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HJR22&jrn=1859&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HJR22&jrn=1861&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HJR22&jrn=1862&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HJR22&jrn=1863&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HJR22&jrn=1864&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HJR22&jrn=2619&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HJR22&jrn=2620&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HJR22&jrn=2621&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HJR22&jrn=2622&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HJR22&jrn=2624&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HJR22&jrn=2625&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HJR22&jrn=2626&hse=S

Bill Comments

feedback