AK HJR18 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/29 LEGIS RESOLVE 26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/29 LEGIS RESOLVE 26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the United States Congress to refrain from passing legislation that designates land in Area 1002 of the Arctic National Wildlife Refuge as wilderness.
Title
Opposing Anwr Wilderness Designation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-05 | PERMANENTLY FILED 7/29 LEGIS RESOLVE 26 | |
2009-08-05 | 4:45 PM 5/27/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-04-19 | VERSION: CSHJR 18(RES) | |
2009-04-19 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2009-04-19 | PASSED Y19 N- V1 | |
2009-04-19 | DYSON, THOMAS, STEVENS | |
2009-04-19 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, MENARD, STEDMAN, MEYER, HUGGINS, OLSON, FRENCH, | |
2009-04-19 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 18(RES) | |
2009-04-19 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-19 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-19 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2009 | |
2009-04-18 | FN1: ZERO(H.RES) | |
2009-04-18 | NR: WIELECHOWSKI | |
2009-04-18 | DP: MCGUIRE, HUGGINS, STEVENS, FRENCH, WAGONER | |
2009-04-18 | RES RPT 5DP 1NR | |
2009-04-02 | COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD | |
2009-03-20 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT, WAGONER, BUNDE | |
2009-03-20 | RES | |
2009-03-20 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-03-19 | VERSION: CSHJR 18(RES) | |
2009-03-19 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2009-03-19 | PASSED Y32 N2 E4 A2 | |
2009-03-19 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 18(RES) | |
2009-03-18 | COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, HAWKER, JOULE, GATTO, JOHANSEN | |
2009-03-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/19 CALENDAR | |
2009-03-18 | RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-03-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-03-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | FN1: ZERO(H.RES) | |
2009-02-25 | AM: GUTTENBERG | |
2009-02-25 | DP: EDGMON, TUCK, P.WILSON, JOHNSON, NEUMAN | |
2009-02-25 | RES RPT CS(RES) 5DP 1AM | |
2009-02-13 | COSPONSOR(S): KELLY | |
2009-02-11 | RES | |
2009-02-11 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Economic Development
Energy
Environmental Concerns
Fish & Game (both)
Land
Oil & Gas
Parks & Recreation
Pipelines
Resources
Energy
Environmental Concerns
Fish & Game (both)
Land
Oil & Gas
Parks & Recreation
Pipelines
Resources