AK HJR17 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, GARDNER, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Encouraging the United States Congress to pass legislation giving full military burial rights to Hmong veterans of the Vietnam War.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hmong Veterans Military Burial Rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, GARDNER, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON
2018-04-09SenateREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2018-04-09SenateSTA
2018-04-09SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-06HouseVERSION: CSHJR 17(MLV)
2018-04-06HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-06HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, TUCK, JOSEPHSON
2018-04-06HousePASSED Y36 E4
2018-04-06HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 17(MLV)
2018-04-06HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-06HouseAM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
2018-04-06HouseMLV CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-06HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-06HouseMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2018-04-05HouseHELD TO 4/6 CALENDAR
2018-04-04HouseHELD TO 4/5 CALENDAR
2018-04-02HouseNOT TAKEN UP 4/2 - ON 4/4 CALENDAR
2018-03-30HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/30 - ON 4/2 CALENDAR
2018-03-29HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/29 - ON 3/30 CALENDAR
2018-03-28HouseTECHNICAL SESSION 3/28 - ON 3/29 CALENDAR
2018-03-27HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/27 - ON 3/28 CALENDAR
2018-03-26HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/26 - ON 3/27 CALENDAR
2018-03-23HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/23 - ON 3/26 CALENDAR
2018-03-22HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/22 - ON 3/23 CALENDAR
2018-03-21HouseCOSPONSOR(S): PARISH
2018-03-21HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/21 - ON 3/22 CALENDAR
2018-03-20HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/20 - ON 3/21 CALENDAR
2018-03-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SADDLER
2018-03-19HouseHELD TO 3/20 CALENDAR
2018-03-19HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2018
2018-02-02HouseFN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
2018-02-02HouseNR: REINBOLD, RAUSCHER
2018-02-02HouseDP: SPOHNHOLZ, PARISH, SADDLER, TUCK
2018-02-02HouseMLV RPT CS(MLV) 4DP 2NR
2017-03-29HouseMLV
2017-03-29HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback