AK HJR16 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-10-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 6 2022 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Hmong Veterans Military Rights

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hmong Veterans Military Rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-06HouseLEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 10
2022-06-06House1:40 P.M. 6/6/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2022-03-18HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2022-02-08SenateVERSION: HJR 16
2022-02-08SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2022-02-08SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON, KIEHL, HOFFMAN
2022-02-08SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2022-02-08SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME HJR 16
2022-02-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/8 CALENDAR
2022-02-04SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-02-04SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/4/2022
2022-02-01SenateFN2: ZERO(S.STA)
2022-02-01SenateDP: SHOWER, HOLLAND, KAWASAKI, REINBOLD, COSTELLO
2022-02-01SenateSTA RPT 5DP
2022-01-18SenateBISHOP, STEDMAN, REVAK, MYERS, MICCICHE
2022-01-18SenateHUGHES, REINBOLD, KAWASAKI, STEVENS, HOLLAND, VON IMHOF,
2022-01-18SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, GRAY-JACKSON, COSTELLO, SHOWER,
2022-01-18SenateSTA
2022-01-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-05-19HouseVERSION: HJR 16
2021-05-19HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2021-05-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN, JOHNSON, SCHRAGE, TILTON, JOSEPHSON, CRONK
2021-05-19HousePASSED Y40
2021-05-19HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HJR 16
2021-05-19HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-05-19HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-19HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021
2021-05-19HouseLIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1
2021-05-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN
2021-05-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY
2021-04-28HouseFN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
2021-04-28HouseNR: RAUSCHER
2021-04-28HouseDP: CLAMAN, NELSON, TARR, STORY, TUCK
2021-04-28HouseMLV RPT 5DP 1NR
2021-04-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS
2021-04-09HouseMLV
2021-04-09HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback