AK HJR13 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States Congress to divide the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Division Of 9th Circuit Ct Of Appeals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24HouseCOSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN
2017-03-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): BIRCH, KNOPP
2017-02-27HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TALERICO
2017-02-24HouseREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2017-02-24HouseSTA, JUD
2017-02-24HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback