AK HJR10 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting Road Belt Electrical Line

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting Road Belt Electrical Line

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30HouseLEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 3
2019-08-30House11:52 AM 8/30/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-08HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2019-05-12SenateVERSION: CSHJR 10(RES)
2019-05-12SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2019-05-12SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2019-05-12SenateSTEDMAN, GIESSEL
2019-05-12SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, SHOWER, GRAY-JACKSON, HUGHES, VON IMHOF, BISHOP
2019-05-12SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 10(RES)
2019-05-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-12SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-12SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2019
2019-05-08SenateFN1: ZERO(H.ENE)
2019-05-08SenateDP: BISHOP, GRAY-JACKSON, HOFFMAN, BIRCH, COSTELLO
2019-05-08SenateCRA RPT 5DP
2019-04-29SenateCRA
2019-04-29SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-04-26HouseVERSION: CSHJR 10(RES)
2019-04-26HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2019-04-26HousePASSED Y37 E3
2019-04-26HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 10(RES)
2019-04-26HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-04-26HouseRES CS ADOPTED UC
2019-04-26HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-04-26HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2019
2019-04-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TUCK
2019-04-03HouseFN1: ZERO(H.ENE)
2019-04-03HouseNR: HOPKINS
2019-04-03HouseDP: TUCK, HANNAN, TALERICO, RAUSCHER, RASMUSSEN, SPOHNHOLZ, TARR
2019-04-03HouseRES RPT CS(RES) 7DP 1NR
2019-03-15HouseFN1: ZERO(H.ENE)
2019-03-15HouseNR: ZULKOSKY, HOPKINS
2019-03-15HouseDP: RAUSCHER, PRUITT, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
2019-03-15HouseENE RPT CS(ENE) 4DP 2NR
2019-03-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
2019-03-04HouseENE, RES
2019-03-04HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback