AK HJR10 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-02 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-02 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the Constitution of the State of Alaska creating a transportation infrastructure fund.
Title
Const. Am: Transportation Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House: CSHJR 10(FIN) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-04-02 | Senate | FN2: (GOV) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | NR: EGAN, FRENCH, DYSON |
2014-04-02 | Senate | DP: BISHOP |
2014-04-02 | Senate | TRA RPT 1DP 3NR |
2014-03-14 | Senate | TRA, FIN |
2014-03-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-13 | House | VERSION: CSHJR 10(FIN) |
2014-03-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-03-13 | House | PASSED Y34 N4 E2 |
2014-03-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 10(FIN) |
2014-03-12 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/13 CALENDAR |
2014-03-12 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-12 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-11 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KITO III |
2014-03-03 | House | FN2: (GOV) |
2014-03-03 | House | NR: GUTTENBERG, GARA, NEUMAN, EDGMON, HOLMES, COSTELLO, AUSTERMAN |
2014-03-03 | House | DP: T.WILSON, MUNOZ |
2014-03-03 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 2DP 7NR |
2014-02-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER, COSTELLO |
2014-02-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON |
2013-04-06 | House | FN1: (GOV) |
2013-04-06 | House | DNP: GRUENBERG |
2013-04-06 | House | DP: FOSTER, LEDOUX, LYNN, PRUITT, KELLER |
2013-04-06 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP 1DNP |
2013-04-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): EDGMON |
2013-03-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN |
2013-03-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HIGGINS, FEIGE, NAGEAK, HUGHES |
2013-03-20 | House | FOSTER |
2013-03-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON, SEATON, MUNOZ, THOMPSON, CHENAULT, LEDOUX, MILLETT, |
2013-02-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, GATTIS |
2013-02-27 | House | FN1: (GOV) |
2013-02-27 | House | DP: LYNN, FEIGE, ISAACSON, GATTIS, KREISS-TOMKINS, P.WILSON |
2013-02-27 | House | TRA RPT 6DP |
2013-02-15 | House | TRA, JUD, FIN |
2013-02-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Airports
Aviation
Boats & Boating
Capital Projects
Constitutional Amendments
Dedicated Funds
Fees
Funds
Highways
Licensing
Marine Facilities
Marine Highway
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Taxation
Tourism
Trails
Transportation
Vessels
Aviation
Boats & Boating
Capital Projects
Constitutional Amendments
Dedicated Funds
Fees
Funds
Highways
Licensing
Marine Facilities
Marine Highway
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Taxation
Tourism
Trails
Transportation
Vessels