AK HCR8 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing the strong support of the Alaska State Legislature for the Kodiak Seafood and Marine Science Center; and urging the University of Alaska to find a solution to keep the Kodiak Seafood and Marine Science Center operating as a stable resource in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kodiak Seafood & Marine Science Center

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-04-07 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-31SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-01-31SenateFN2: ZERO(LEG)
2018-01-31SenateNR: MICCICHE, MEYER
2018-01-31SenateDP: COSTELLO, GARDNER
2018-01-31SenateL&C RPT 2DP 2NR
2017-04-14SenateEDC REFERRAL WAIVED UC
2017-04-10SenateEDC, L&C
2017-04-10SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-07HouseVERSION: HCR 8 AM
2017-04-07HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-04-07HousePASSED Y40
2017-04-07House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2017-04-07HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2017-04-07HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-07HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2017
2017-03-29HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-03-29HouseNR: NEUMAN
2017-03-29HouseDP: TARR, FANSLER, KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES
2017-03-29HouseFSH RPT 4DP 1NR
2017-03-01HouseFSH
2017-03-01HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback