AK HCR4 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-10 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/10 LEGIS RESOLVE 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-10 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/10 LEGIS RESOLVE 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspend Uniform Rules For Sb 140
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Sb 140
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-10 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 9/10 LEGIS RESOLVE 11 |
2024-02-28 | House | 1:15 P.M. 2/28/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-02-26 | Senate | VERSION: HCR 4 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2024-02-26 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | TAKEN UP |
2024-02-22 | House | VERSION: HCR 4 |
2024-02-22 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2024-02-22 | House | PASSED Y39 N1 |
2024-02-22 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2024-02-19 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/19/2024 |
2024-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |