AK HCR30 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning Senate Bill No. 163, relating to commercial motor vehicles.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Sb 163
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2018-05-01 | Senate | VERSION: HCR 30 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-01 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2018-05-01 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2018-05-01 | Senate | TAKEN UP UC |
2018-04-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
2018-04-13 | House | VERSION: HCR 30 |
2018-04-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-13 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2018-04-13 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2018-04-13 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |