AK HCR3 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to promoting the safety and protection of older Alaskans.
Title
Senior Citizen Protections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-24 | PERMANENTLY FILED 7/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 14 | |
2011-05-10 | 3:18 PM 5/10/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2011-05-02 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2011-04-14 | VERSION: CSHCR 3(HSS) AM | |
2011-04-14 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2011-04-14 | DAVIS, MCGUIRE | |
2011-04-14 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, GIESSEL, DYSON, ELLIS, MEYER, MENARD, EGAN, | |
2011-04-14 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2011-04-14 | BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2011-04-14 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-14 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | FN1: ZERO(LEG) | |
2011-04-06 | DP: DAVIS, MEYER, ELLIS, EGAN | |
2011-04-06 | HSS RPT 4DP | |
2011-03-28 | HSS | |
2011-03-28 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-03-25 | VERSION: CSHCR 3(HSS) AM | |
2011-03-25 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2011-03-25 | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, COSTELLO, HOLMES, FAIRCLOUGH, GARDNER, JOHANSEN | |
2011-03-25 | PASSED Y34 E6 | |
2011-03-25 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-03-25 | HSS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-03-25 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-03-25 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2011 | |
2011-03-11 | COSPONSOR(S): HERRON, MILLETT, KERTTULA, KELLER | |
2011-03-11 | FN1: ZERO(LEG) | |
2011-03-11 | DP: KERTTULA, MILLETT, DICK, SEATON, MILLER, HERRON, KELLER | |
2011-03-11 | HSS RPT CS(HSS) 7DP | |
2011-01-24 | HSS | |
2011-01-24 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Crimes
Disabilities
Families
Governor
Health & Social Services
Nursing Homes
Ombudsman
Public Safety
Retirement
Senior Citizens
Disabilities
Families
Governor
Health & Social Services
Nursing Homes
Ombudsman
Public Safety
Retirement
Senior Citizens