AK HCR29 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-09 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-09 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning Senate Bill No. 135, relating to the rights of crime victims; relating to the duties of prosecuting attorneys; and amending Rule 45, Alaska Rules of Criminal Procedure.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Sb 135
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-09 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 53 | |
2012-06-06 | 2:50 PM 6/6/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-04-15 | VERSION: HCR 29 | |
2012-04-15 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2012-04-15 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2012-04-15 | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK | |
2012-04-14 | VERSION: HCR 29 | |
2012-04-14 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2012-04-14 | PASSED Y38 A1 V1 | |
2012-04-14 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-14 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2012 | |
2012-04-13 | RLS FOR CALENDARING | |
2012-04-13 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Attorneys
Court Rules
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Public Defender
Public Employees
Rights
Uniform Rules
Victims Rights
Court Rules
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Public Defender
Public Employees
Rights
Uniform Rules
Victims Rights
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=27&bill=HCR29 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/27/Bills/HCR029A.PDF |