AK HCR24 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - 2:20 PM 4/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - 2:20 PM 4/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing, honoring, supporting, and encouraging support for dog mushing and dog mushers in the state.
Title
Supporting Dog Mushing
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | 2:20 PM 4/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-03-17 | Senate | VERSION: HCR 24 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-03-17 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-03-17 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2014-03-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
2014-03-14 | House | VERSION: HCR 24 |
2014-03-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-03-14 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2014-03-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/14/2014 |
2014-03-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.CRA) |
2014-03-13 | House | DP: KITO III, FOSTER, NAGEAK, LEDOUX |
2014-03-13 | House | CRA RPT 4DP |
2014-03-03 | House | CRA |
2014-03-03 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |