AK HCR21 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proclaiming April 2014 as Child Abuse Prevention Month.
Title
Child Abuse Prevention Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: HCR 21 Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: HCR 21 Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 4/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 36 |
2014-04-16 | House | 2:20 PM 4/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-04 | Senate | VERSION: HCR 21 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-04 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | DUNLEAVY |
2014-04-04 | Senate | STEDMAN, FRENCH, STEVENS, OLSON, ELLIS, WIELECHOWSKI, MICCICHE, DYSON, KELLY |
2014-04-04 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARDNER, BISHOP, MCGUIRE, EGAN, GIESSEL, FAIRCLOUGH, HOFFMAN, |
2014-04-04 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME AND BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2014-04-03 | House | VERSION: HCR 21 |
2014-04-03 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, LYNN, GARA, DRUMMOND, MILLETT |
2014-04-03 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2014-04-03 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-03 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.HSS) |
2014-03-26 | House | DP: SEATON, KELLER, NAGEAK, HIGGINS |
2014-03-26 | House | HSS RPT 4DP |
2014-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KITO III |
2014-02-26 | House | HSS |
2014-02-26 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |