AK HCR17 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/23 LEGIS RESOLVE 47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/23 LEGIS RESOLVE 47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the aviation industry; and urging the governor to make state-owned land available to the unmanned aircraft systems industry for the management and operation of unmanned aircraft systems and related research, manufacturing, testing, and training.
Title
Support Aviation Industry; Use State Land
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 13 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-21 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-21 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-21 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 13 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-21 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-21 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 9/23 LEGIS RESOLVE 47 |
2016-07-11 | House | 11:39 AM 7/6/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-04-16 | Senate | VERSION: CSHCR 17(TRA) |
2016-04-16 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2016-04-16 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2016-04-16 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2016-04-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2016-04-14 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN |
2016-04-14 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, COSTELLO, COGHILL |
2016-04-14 | Senate | RES RPT 3DP 1NR |
2016-04-06 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN |
2016-04-06 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE, EGAN, BISHOP |
2016-04-06 | Senate | TRA RPT 3DP 1NR |
2016-03-23 | Senate | TRA, RES |
2016-03-23 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-03-21 | House | VERSION: CSHCR 17(TRA) |
2016-03-21 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2016-03-21 | House | PASSED Y33 N6 E1 |
2016-03-21 | House | AM NO 3 FAILED Y13 N26 E1 |
2016-03-21 | House | AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED |
2016-03-21 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y16 N23 E1 |
2016-03-21 | House | AM TO AM 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2016-03-21 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED |
2016-03-21 | House | TRA CS ADOPTED UC |
2016-03-21 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-03-21 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2016-03-16 | House | NR: ORTIZ |
2016-03-16 | House | DP: NAGEAK, STUTES, CLAMAN, HUGHES, FOSTER |
2016-03-16 | House | TRA RPT CS(TRA) 5DP 1NR |
2016-01-29 | House | TRA |
2016-01-29 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |