AK HCR13 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Support Future Of Permanent Fund/dividend
Title
Support Future Of Permanent Fund/dividend
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 to Amendment No. 3 as amended (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 3 (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 to Amendment No. 3 as amended (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 3 (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-03-04 | Senate | RLS |
2020-03-04 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2020-03-02 | House | VERSION: HCR 13 AM |
2020-03-02 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2020-03-02 | House | PASSED Y24 N15 E1 |
2020-03-02 | House | BEFORE HOUSE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2020-02-28 | House | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 3/2 CALENDAR |
2020-02-28 | 1733 | |
2020-02-28 | 1732 | |
2020-02-28 | 1732 | |
2020-02-28 | 1732 | |
2020-02-28 | House | AM 2 TO AM 3 ADOPTED Y25 N3 E12 |
2020-02-28 | House | AM 1 TO AM 3 ADOPTED Y20 N8 E12 |
2020-02-28 | House | AM 1 TO AM 3 OFFERED AND PENDING |
2020-02-28 | 1729 | |
2020-02-28 | 1728 | |
2020-02-28 | 1728 | |
2020-02-28 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-02-26 | House | HELD TO 2/28 CALENDAR |
2020-02-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | RLS |
2020-02-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Budget
Corporations
Economic Development
Economy
Funds
Investments
Legislature
Oil & Gas
Permanent Fund
Revenue
Corporations
Economic Development
Economy
Funds
Investments
Legislature
Oil & Gas
Permanent Fund
Revenue