AK HCR10 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Special Session: Perm. Fund
Title
Special Session: Perm. Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE |
2020-01-21 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 1/21/2020 |
2019-05-15 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 5/15 - ON 1/21/20 CALENDAR |
2019-05-15 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2019 |
2019-05-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HCR10 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HCR010A.PDF |