AK HCR1 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the Governor to acknowledge officially the sovereignty of Alaska tribal governments, to create clear and consistent policies for increased state collaboration and partnership with tribes, and to direct the attorney general to conduct a complete review of the state's litigation against Alaska Native tribes; urging the Governor to acknowledge the inherent criminal jurisdiction of Alaska tribal governments over tribal members within the boundaries of their villages; urging the Governor to cooperate with tribes' efforts to transfer Native land to trust; and urging the Governor to support multilateral negotiations between tribal governments, nontribal municipalities, and the state government to delineate clearly tribal geographical jurisdictions.
Title
Governor:tribal Sovereignty And Juris.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-04-03 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.CRA) |
2015-04-03 | House | AM: GRUENBERG |
2015-04-03 | House | NR: LEDOUX |
2015-04-03 | House | DNP: LYNN |
2015-04-03 | House | DP: CLAMAN, FOSTER |
2015-04-03 | House | JUD RPT CS(CRA) NT 2DP 1DNP 1NR 1AM |
2015-03-11 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.CRA) |
2015-03-11 | House | NR: REINBOLD, HUGHES, TILTON |
2015-03-11 | House | DP: DRUMMOND, NAGEAK, SEATON, ORTIZ |
2015-03-11 | House | CRA RPT CS(CRA) NT 4DP 3NR |
2015-02-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2015-01-21 | House | CRA, JUD |
2015-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Attorney General
Boundaries
Executive Branch
Governor
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Law Enforcement
Native Organizations
Natives
Public Safety
Boundaries
Executive Branch
Governor
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Law Enforcement
Native Organizations
Natives
Public Safety