AK HB97 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-15 - COSPONSOR(S): TUCK
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-15 - COSPONSOR(S): TUCK
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to office accounts for each member of the legislature for legislative office expenses.
Title
Legislative Office Accounts
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Rep. Cathy Munoz [R] | Rep. Leslie Gara [D] |
Rep. Chris Tuck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2013-02-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA |
2013-02-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ |
2013-02-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON |
2013-02-01 | House | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2013-02-01 | House | STA, JUD |
2013-02-01 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=28&bill=HB97 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HB0097A.PDF |