AK HB90 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to occupational licensing fees; relating to an occupational investigation surcharge; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Occ. Licensing Fees; Investigation Costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | House | WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR |
2017-04-21 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-04-21 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2017-04-21 | House | AM: KAWASAKI, PRUITT |
2017-04-21 | House | NR: ORTIZ, THOMPSON, TILTON |
2017-04-21 | House | DNP: WILSON, GRENN |
2017-04-21 | House | DP: GARA, GUTTENBERG, SEATON, FOSTER |
2017-04-21 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 4DP 2DNP 3NR 2AM |
2017-03-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG |
2017-03-03 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2017-03-03 | House | NR: STUTES |
2017-03-03 | House | DNP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, BIRCH, KNOPP |
2017-03-03 | House | DP: WOOL, JOSEPHSON, KITO |
2017-03-03 | House | L&C RPT 3DP 3DNP 1NR |
2017-01-30 | House | L&C, FIN |
2017-01-30 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Administrative Procedure
Boards & Commissions
Business
Fees
Licensing
Occupations & Professions
Regulations
Regulatory Actions
Boards & Commissions
Business
Fees
Licensing
Occupations & Professions
Regulations
Regulatory Actions
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB90 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0090A.PDF |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0090B.PDF |