AK HB87 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to electric-assisted bicycles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric-assisted Bicycles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 3 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 2 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 3 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2021-05-19SenateTRA, STA
2021-05-19SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-05-19HouseVERSION: CSHB 87(JUD)
2021-05-19HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2021-05-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE, KAUFMAN, JOHNSON, JOSEPHSON
2021-05-19HousePASSED Y38 N1 A1
2021-05-19HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 87(JUD)
2021-05-19HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-05-19HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y3 N37
2021-05-19HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y2 N38
2021-05-19HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N33
2021-05-19HouseJUD CS ADOPTED UC
2021-05-19HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-19HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021
2021-05-19HouseLIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1
2021-05-10HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2021-05-10HouseAM: EASTMAN, KURKA
2021-05-10HouseDP: VANCE, KREISS-TOMKINS, DRUMMOND, SNYDER, CLAMAN
2021-05-10HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP 2AM
2021-04-28HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2021-04-28HouseNR: CRONK, HOPKINS
2021-04-28HouseDP: DRUMMOND, HANNAN, MCKAY, MCCABE
2021-04-28HouseTRA RPT 4DP 2NR
2021-02-18HouseTRA, JUD
2021-02-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback