AK HB77 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - REFERRED TO RESOURCES
Pending: Senate Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - REFERRED TO RESOURCES
Pending: Senate Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Alaska Land Act, including certain authorizations, contracts, leases, permits, or other disposals of state land, resources, property, or interests; relating to authorization for the use of state land by general permit; relating to exchange of state land; establishing that performance of a feasibility study for the development and operation of a hydroelectric site at Chikuminuk Lake is not considered an incompatible use of the Wood-Tikchik State Park; relating to procedures for certain administrative appeals and requests for reconsideration to the commissioner of natural resources; relating to the Alaska Water Use Act; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Land Use/disp/exchanges; Water Rights
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 12 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 17 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 17 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RESOURCES |
2014-03-10 | Senate | RES REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RLS |
2013-04-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE |
2013-04-14 | Senate | BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING |
2013-04-13 | Senate | BILL NOT TAKEN UP 4/13 - ON 4/14 CALENDAR |
2013-04-13 | Senate | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2013-04-13 | Senate | BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING |
2013-04-12 | Senate | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 4/13 CALENDAR |
2013-04-11 | Senate | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 4/12 CALENDAR |
2013-04-11 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 77(FIN) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/11 CALENDAR |
2013-04-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/10 CALENDAR |
2013-04-09 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-09 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-09 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DNR) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DFG) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | AM: HOFFMAN |
2013-04-08 | Senate | NR: BISHOP |
2013-04-08 | Senate | DNP: OLSON |
2013-04-08 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MEYER, DUNLEAVY, FAIRCLOUGH |
2013-04-08 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 7 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 4DP 1DNP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE |
2013-03-11 | Senate | FIN |
2013-03-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-03-04 | House | VERSION: CSHB 77(RES) |
2013-03-04 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2013-03-04 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y31 N6 E3 |
2013-03-04 | House | PASSED Y23 N14 E3 |
2013-03-04 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2013-03-04 | House | AM NO 4 FAILED Y17 N20 E3 |
2013-03-04 | House | AM NO 3 FAILED Y14 N23 E3 |
2013-03-04 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y12 N25 E3 |
2013-03-04 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y12 N24 E3 A1 |
2013-03-04 | House | BEFORE HOUSE WITH AM NO 1 PENDING |
2013-03-04 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED |
2013-03-04 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 & ALL AMS UC |
2013-03-04 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 77(RES) |
2013-02-27 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/4 CALENDAR |
2013-02-27 | House | RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-02-27 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-02-27 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | FN2: ZERO(DFG) |
2013-02-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2013-02-13 | House | AM: TUCK, SEATON, TARR |
2013-02-13 | House | DP: HAWKER, OLSON, FEIGE, SADDLER |
2013-02-13 | House | RES RPT CS(RES) 4DP 3AM |
2013-01-18 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2013-01-18 | House | FN2: ZERO(DFG) |
2013-01-18 | House | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2013-01-18 | House | RES |
2013-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |