AK HB75 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, WOOL
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, WOOL
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to gun violence protective orders; relating to the crime of violating a protective order; relating to a central registry for protective orders; relating to the powers of district judges and magistrates; requiring physicians, psychologists, psychological associates, social workers, marital and family therapists, and licensed professional counselors to report annually threats of gun violence; and amending Rules 4 and 65, Alaska Rules of Civil Procedure, and Rule 9, Alaska Rules of Administration.
Title
Gun Violence Protective Orders
Sponsors
Rep. Geran Tarr [D] | Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] | Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] | Rep. Paul Seaton [R] |
Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Rep. Adam Wool [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, WOOL |
2018-03-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SEATON |
2018-02-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2018-02-21 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2017-01-23 | House | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-01-23 | House | JUD, FIN |
2017-01-23 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Injunctions
Judges
Law Enforcement
Legislature
Mental Health
Physicians
Psychologists
Weapons
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Injunctions
Judges
Law Enforcement
Legislature
Mental Health
Physicians
Psychologists
Weapons
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB75 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0075A.PDF |