AK HB64 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the establishment of the Legislative Task Force on Reading Proficiency and Dyslexia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reading Proficiency Task Force; Dyslexia

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-05-01HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-01HouseTITLE CHANGE: SCR 16
2018-05-01HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N1 E2
2018-05-01HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2018-04-28HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-04-27SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 64(EDC)
2018-04-27SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-04-27SenateVON IMHOF, MEYER, WILSON, HUGHES, MICCICHE
2018-04-27SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): STEVENS, MACKINNON, SHOWER, GIESSEL, STEDMAN, BISHOP
2018-04-27SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2018-04-27SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 64(EDC)
2018-04-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-27SenateEDC SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-27SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-27SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/2018
2018-03-16SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, GARDNER
2018-02-05SenateFN2: ZERO(LEG)
2018-02-05SenateDP: STEVENS, BEGICH, COGHILL, HUGHES
2018-02-05SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 16
2018-02-05SenateEDC RPT SCS 4DP NEW TITLE
2017-03-27SenateEDC
2017-03-27SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-03-24HouseVERSION: CSHB 64(EDC)
2017-03-24HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-03-24HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2017-03-24HousePASSED Y33 N3 E4
2017-03-24HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 64(EDC)
2017-03-22HouseCOSPONSOR(S): BIRCH, TARR
2017-03-22HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/24 CALENDAR
2017-03-22HouseEDC CS ADOPTED UC
2017-03-22HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-22HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2017
2017-03-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
2017-03-10HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-03-10HouseDP: TALERICO, PARISH, SPOHNHOLZ, KOPP, JOHNSTON, FANSLER, DRUMMOND
2017-03-10HouseEDC RPT CS(EDC) 7DP
2017-02-22HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TALERICO
2017-02-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA
2017-01-20HouseEDC
2017-01-20HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback