AK HB64 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-06 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-06 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to permanent motor vehicle registration; relating to the registration fee for noncommercial trailers and to the motor vehicle tax for trailers; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Perm. Mot. Veh. Registration/trailers
Sponsors
Sen. Mia Costello [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Wes Keller [R] | Rep. Robert Lynn [R] |
Rep. Charisse Millett [R] | Rep. Mark Neuman [R] | Rep. Dan Saddler [R] | Sen. Bill Stoltze [R] |
Rep. Tammie Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-06 | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS | |
2012-04-06 | STA, FIN | |
2012-04-06 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-04-04 | VERSION: CSHB 64(FIN)(EFD AM) | |
2012-04-04 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2012-04-04 | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, SADDLER | |
2012-04-04 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-04 | PASSED Y39 A1 | |
2012-04-04 | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING | |
2012-04-04 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-04 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-04 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 64(FIN) | |
2012-04-03 | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON | |
2012-04-03 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/4 CALENDAR | |
2012-04-03 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-03 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-03 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2012 | |
2012-04-02 | FN4: (ADM) | |
2012-04-02 | AM: NEUMAN | |
2012-04-02 | NR: GARA | |
2012-04-02 | THOMAS | |
2012-04-02 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, COSTELLO, EDGMON, DOOGAN, STOLTZE, | |
2012-04-02 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 8DP 1NR 1AM | |
2012-03-30 | COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON | |
2011-03-25 | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN | |
2011-03-16 | FN3: (ADM) | |
2011-03-16 | FN2: (DEC) | |
2011-03-16 | AM: JOHNSON | |
2011-03-16 | NR: MUNOZ, PETERSEN, GRUENBERG | |
2011-03-16 | DP: FEIGE, PRUITT, P.WILSON | |
2011-03-16 | TRA RPT CS(TRA) 3DP 3NR 1AM | |
2011-02-14 | COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN | |
2011-02-11 | TRA REFERRAL ADDED AFTER STA | |
2011-02-11 | FN2: (DEC) | |
2011-02-11 | FN1: (ADM) | |
2011-02-11 | AM: P.WILSON, SEATON, PETERSEN | |
2011-02-11 | NR: JOHANSEN, GRUENBERG | |
2011-02-11 | DP: KELLER, LYNN | |
2011-02-11 | STA RPT 2DP 2NR 3AM | |
2011-01-18 | STA, FIN | |
2011-01-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-01-18 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11 |