AK HB6 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/22/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/22/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the governor to remove or suspend a member of the Board of Regents of the University of Alaska for good cause; and establishing a procedure for the removal or suspension of a regent.
Title
Removing A Regent
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/22/12 | |
2012-05-24 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/24 CHAPTER 41 SLA 12 | |
2012-05-17 | 4:15 PM 5/17/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-04-12 | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 A2 V1 | |
2012-04-09 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2012-04-06 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 6(JUD) | |
2012-04-06 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2012-04-06 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2012-04-06 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 6(JUD) | |
2012-04-06 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-06 | JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-06 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-06 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | FN4: ZERO(ADM) | |
2012-04-04 | FN3: ZERO(UA) | |
2012-04-04 | NR: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI | |
2012-04-04 | DP: FRENCH | |
2012-04-04 | JUD RPT SCS 1DP 2NR SAME TITLE | |
2011-04-12 | JUD | |
2011-04-12 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-04-11 | VERSION: CSHB 6(JUD) AM | |
2011-04-11 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2011-04-11 | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, GARDNER | |
2011-04-11 | PASSED Y39 A1 | |
2011-04-11 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 6(JUD) AM | |
2011-04-11 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-11 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-11 | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-11 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-11 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | FN2: ZERO(UA) | |
2011-04-05 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2011-04-05 | AM: KELLER | |
2011-04-05 | NR: PRUITT | |
2011-04-05 | DP: GRUENBERG, HOLMES, THOMPSON | |
2011-04-05 | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 1NR 1AM | |
2011-02-23 | FN2: ZERO(UA) | |
2011-02-23 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2011-02-23 | DP: P.WILSON, SEATON, KAWASAKI, FEIGE, DICK | |
2011-02-23 | EDC RPT CS(EDC) 5DP | |
2011-01-18 | EDC, JUD | |
2011-01-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-01-18 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11 |