AK HB43 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/11/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/11/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to prescribing, dispensing, and administering an investigational drug, biological product, or device by physicians for patients who are terminally ill for the purpose of sustaining the patient's life; providing immunity related to manufacturing, distributing, or providing investigational drugs, biological products, or devices; and relating to licensed health care facility requirements.
Title
New Drugs For The Terminally Ill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/11/18 |
2018-07-16 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 53 SLA 18 |
2018-07-09 | House | 1:37 PM 7/9/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-04-28 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 43(JUD) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-04-25 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): VON IMHOF |
2018-04-25 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2018-04-25 | Senate | MICCICHE, GARDNER, HUGHES, BEGICH, EGAN, MEYER |
2018-04-25 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, SHOWER, COSTELLO, GIESSEL, BISHOP, MACKINNON |
2018-04-25 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 43(JUD) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-25 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-25 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | NR: COSTELLO, KELLY, SHOWER |
2018-03-28 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI |
2018-03-28 | Senate | JUD RPT 2DP 3NR |
2018-01-31 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE |
2018-01-31 | Senate | DP: VON IMHOF, BEGICH, GIESSEL |
2018-01-31 | Senate | HSS RPT 3DP 1NR |
2017-04-11 | Senate | HSS, JUD |
2017-04-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-04-10 | House | VERSION: CSHB 43(JUD) |
2017-04-10 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-04-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, KNOPP, TARR, JOSEPHSON, TILTON, RAUSCHER |
2017-04-10 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2017-04-10 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 43(JUD) |
2017-04-10 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2017-04-10 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2017-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FANSLER, PARISH |
2017-04-09 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/10 CALENDAR |
2017-04-09 | House | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2017-04-09 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-09 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, EASTMAN |
2017-04-05 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2017-04-05 | House | NR: REINBOLD |
2017-04-05 | House | DP: EASTMAN, KOPP, FANSLER, LEDOUX, CLAMAN |
2017-04-05 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP 1NR |
2017-03-08 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2017-03-08 | House | AM: EASTMAN |
2017-03-08 | House | NR: KITO |
2017-03-08 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, TARR, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, SPOHNHOLZ |
2017-03-08 | House | HSS RPT 5DP 1NR 1AM |
2017-01-18 | House | HSS, JUD |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-01-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/13/17 |