AK HB382 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to insurance coverage for pharmacy services.
Title
Insulin Coverage:insurance;medicaid
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-05-03 | House | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2022-05-03 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS/DOH) |
2022-05-03 | House | AM: KAUFMAN, MCCARTY, NELSON |
2022-05-03 | House | DP: SCHRAGE, SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ |
2022-05-03 | House | L&C RPT CS(HSS) 4DP 3AM |
2022-04-29 | House | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2022-04-29 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS/DOH) |
2022-04-29 | House | DNP: KURKA, PRAX, MCCARTY |
2022-04-29 | House | DP: SPOHNHOLZ, FIELDS, ZULKOSKY, SNYDER |
2022-04-29 | House | HSS RPT CS(HSS) 4DP 3DNP |
2022-02-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2022-02-22 | House | HSS, L&C |
2022-02-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=HB382 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0382A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0382B.PDF |