AK HB366 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-19 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-19 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing an Alaska intrastate mutual aid system and relating to the duties of the Alaska division of homeland security and emergency management and the duties of the Alaska State Emergency Response Commission.
Title
Disaster Planning And Services
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/12 | |
2012-06-19 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 67 SLA 12 | |
2012-06-11 | 3:04 PM 6/11/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-04-15 | VERSION: HB 366 | |
2012-04-15 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2012-04-15 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 366 | |
2012-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-15 | RULES TO 2ND SUP CALENDAR 4/15/12 | |
2012-04-13 | FN1: ZERO(MVA) | |
2012-04-13 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, ELLIS | |
2012-04-13 | FIN RPT 6DP | |
2012-04-02 | FIN | |
2012-04-02 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-03-30 | VERSION: HB 366 | |
2012-03-30 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2012-03-30 | PASSED Y35 E5 | |
2012-03-30 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 366 | |
2012-03-30 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-30 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-03-30 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/30/2012 | |
2012-03-29 | FN1: ZERO(MVA) | |
2012-03-29 | DP: AUSTERMAN, DICK, FOSTER, SADDLER, GARDNER, MUNOZ | |
2012-03-29 | CRA RPT 6DP | |
2012-03-28 | FN1: ZERO(MVA) | |
2012-03-28 | DP: MILLER, AUSTERMAN, CISSNA, LYNN, THOMPSON, SADDLER | |
2012-03-28 | MLV RPT 6DP | |
2012-03-15 | MLV, CRA | |
2012-03-15 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Disaster
Environmental Concerns
Government Organization
Governor
Intergovernmental Relations
Municipalities
Public Safety
Safety
Unorganized Borough
Environmental Concerns
Government Organization
Governor
Intergovernmental Relations
Municipalities
Public Safety
Safety
Unorganized Borough