AK HB354 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to dive fishery management assessment procedures.
Title
Dive Fishery Assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2018-05-02 | Senate | VERSION: HB 354 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-02 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 354 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-02 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-02 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, MEYER |
2018-04-17 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, COGHILL, STEDMAN |
2018-04-17 | Senate | RES RPT 4DP 2NR |
2018-04-09 | Senate | RES |
2018-04-09 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-06 | House | VERSION: HB 354 |
2018-04-06 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-06 | House | PASSED Y36 N2 E2 |
2018-04-06 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 354 |
2018-04-06 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-06 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-06 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2018-03-28 | House | NR: BIRCH, RAUSCHER |
2018-03-28 | House | DP: LINCOLN, PARISH, TALERICO, DRUMMOND, TARR |
2018-03-28 | House | RES RPT 5DP 2NR |
2018-03-09 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2018-03-09 | House | NR: NEUMAN |
2018-03-09 | House | DP: TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES |
2018-03-09 | House | FSH RPT 3DP 1NR |
2018-02-16 | House | FSH, RES |
2018-02-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |