AK HB354 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/13/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/13/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to eligibility for loans from the Alaska capstone avionics revolving loan fund.
Title
Ak Capstone Avionics Revolving Loan Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/13/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/15 CHAPTER 76 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:19 PM 6/7/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-16 | VERSION: HB 354 | |
2010-04-16 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-16 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): THOMAS | |
2010-04-16 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2010-04-16 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 354 | |
2010-04-16 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-16 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-16 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-04-13 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, OLSON, ELLIS | |
2010-04-13 | FIN RPT 7DP | |
2010-04-10 | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C | |
2010-04-08 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, DYSON, HUGGINS | |
2010-04-07 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-04-07 | DP: PASKVAN, BUNDE, THOMAS, MEYER | |
2010-04-07 | L&C RPT 4DP | |
2010-03-26 | L&C | |
2010-03-26 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-25 | VERSION: HB 354 | |
2010-03-25 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-03-25 | COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN | |
2010-03-25 | PASSED Y31 E5 A4 | |
2010-03-25 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 354 | |
2010-03-25 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-25 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-25 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2010 | |
2010-03-12 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-03-12 | DP: JOHANSEN, MUNOZ, JOHNSON, T.WILSON, GRUENBERG, PETERSEN, P.WILSON | |
2010-03-12 | TRA RPT 7DP | |
2010-03-10 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-03-10 | DP: BUCH, NEUMAN, CHENAULT, OLSON | |
2010-03-10 | L&C RPT 4DP | |
2010-02-23 | TRA REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C | |
2010-02-19 | L&C | |
2010-02-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |