AK HB347 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - VERSION: CSHB 347(CRA) AM
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Beltz 105 (tsbldg)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - VERSION: CSHB 347(CRA) AM
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Beltz 105 (tsbldg)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to assessment of property, boards of equalization, and certification of assessors; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Property Assessment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 3 (Y: 2 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 3 (Y: 2 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | VERSION: CSHB 347(CRA) AM |
2024-04-26 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2024-04-26 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-04-26 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y32 N1 E2 A5 |
2024-04-26 | House | RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING |
2024-04-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ALLARD, CRONK, SADDLER |
2024-04-24 | House | EASTMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2024-04-24 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-04-24 | House | PASSED Y36 N2 E2 |
2024-04-24 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 347(CRA) AM |
2024-04-18 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/24 CALENDAR |
2024-04-22 | House | AM NO 9 NOT OFFERED |
2024-04-22 | House | AM NO 8 ADOPTED Y37 E2 A1 |
2024-04-22 | House | AM NO 7 FAILED Y1 N37 E2 |
2024-04-22 | House | AM NO 6 FAILED Y1 N37 E2 |
2024-04-22 | House | AM NO 5 FAILED Y1 N37 E2 |
2024-04-22 | House | AM NO 4 FAILED Y11 N27 E2 |
2024-04-22 | House | AM NO 3 FAILED Y13 N25 E2 |
2024-04-22 | House | AM 1 TO AM 3 FAILED Y2 N36 E2 |
2024-04-22 | House | AM NO 3 OFFERED |
2024-04-22 | House | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC |
2024-04-22 | House | AM NO 1 WITHDRAWN |
2024-04-22 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2024-04-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, WRIGHT |
2024-04-18 | House | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 4/22 CALENDAR |
2024-04-18 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED AND PENDING |
2024-04-18 | House | CRA CS ADOPTED UC |
2024-04-18 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-04-18 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER, HANNAN, VANCE |
2024-03-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER |
2024-03-20 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2024-03-20 | House | AM: RUFFRIDGE |
2024-03-20 | House | NR: MEARS, HIMSCHOOT |
2024-03-20 | House | DP: MCCABE, BAKER, MCKAY, MCCORMICK |
2024-03-20 | House | CRA RPT CS(CRA) 4DP 2NR 1AM |
2024-03-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY |
2024-03-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PRAX |
2024-02-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TOMASZEWSKI |
2024-02-20 | House | CRA |
2024-02-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |