AK HB345 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/23/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/23/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the bridge to be built on the Dalton Highway at approximately mile post 308 as the Sam Schuyler Memorial Bridge.
Title
Sam Schuyler Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Ramras [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/23/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 107 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:35 PM 6/14/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: HB 345 | |
2010-04-18 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 345 | |
2010-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-18 | FN1: ZERO(DOT) | |
2010-04-18 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, OLSON, ELLIS | |
2010-04-18 | FIN RPT 7DP | |
2010-04-18 | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR | |
2010-04-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | FIN | |
2010-03-02 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-01 | VERSION: HB 345 | |
2010-03-01 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-03-01 | PASSED Y33 E6 A1 | |
2010-03-01 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 345 | |
2010-03-01 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-01 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-01 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | FN1: ZERO(DOT) | |
2010-02-24 | DP: PETERSEN, GRUENBERG, JOHNSON, MUNOZ, JOHANSEN, P.WILSON | |
2010-02-24 | TRA RPT 6DP | |
2010-02-15 | TRA | |
2010-02-15 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |