AK HB337 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing 4-H Day.
Title
Establishing 4-h Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-04-26 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2024-04-26 | Senate | DP: DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON, BJORKMAN |
2024-04-26 | Senate | CRA RPT 3DP |
2024-04-19 | Senate | CRA |
2024-04-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-04-17 | House | VERSION: HB 337 |
2024-04-17 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2024-04-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CRONK, STAPP, ARMSTRONG, SADDLER, TILTON |
2024-04-17 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2024-04-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 337 |
2024-04-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GALVIN, JOSEPHSON, WRIGHT |
2024-04-15 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/17 CALENDAR |
2024-04-15 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-04-15 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2024 |
2024-03-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2024-03-28 | House | NR: MCCABE |
2024-03-28 | House | DP: HIMSCHOOT, MCKAY, BAKER, MEARS, MCCORMICK |
2024-03-28 | House | CRA RPT 5DP 1NR |
2024-03-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER |
2024-02-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER |
2024-02-21 | House | PRIME SPONSOR CHANGED: MEARS REPLACED FIELDS |
2024-02-20 | House | CRA |
2024-02-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |