AK HB331 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-01 - COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-01 - COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to funding for youth courts; and relating to accounting for criminal fines.
Title
Youth Courts And Criminal Fines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM | |
2010-03-01 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-03-01 | FN1: ZERO(DHS) | |
2010-03-01 | DP: LYNN, GRUENBERG, HERRON, DAHLSTROM, RAMRAS | |
2010-03-01 | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP | |
2010-02-26 | COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES | |
2010-02-17 | COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON, GATTO, SEATON, N.FOSTER | |
2010-02-15 | COSPONSOR(S): RAMRAS | |
2010-02-08 | JUD, FIN | |
2010-02-08 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |