AK HB33 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/18/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/18/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending certain provisions of criminal law prohibiting the manufacture, sale, transfer, or possession of switchblades and gravity knives; adding definitions of 'gravity knife' and 'switchblade' to the criminal law; and reserving to the state, with limited exceptions for municipalities, the authority to regulate knives.
Title
Knives, Gravity Knives, & Switchblades
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-10 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/18/13 |
2013-09-10 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 54 SLA 13 |
2013-06-24 | House | 11:51 AM 6/13/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-04-12 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 E2 A1 |
2013-04-12 | House | CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE |
2013-04-09 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2013-04-09 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 33(JUD) |
2013-04-09 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2013-04-09 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2013-04-09 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 33(JUD) |
2013-04-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-09 | Senate | JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-09 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-09 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | FN6: ZERO(COR) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(LAW) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(CED) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE, DYSON |
2013-04-04 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 4 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | JUD RPT SCS 4DP NEW TITLE |
2013-03-29 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, GIESSEL, DYSON, MCGUIRE, DUNLEAVY |
2013-03-28 | Senate | JUD |
2013-03-28 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-03-27 | House | VERSION: HB 33 |
2013-03-27 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2013-03-27 | House | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2013-03-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, OLSON, TUCK, JOHNSON, SADDLER, LEDOUX |
2013-03-26 | House | JOSEPHSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2013-03-26 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2013-03-26 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 33 |
2013-03-26 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-03-26 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-03-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT |
2013-03-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON |
2013-03-01 | House | FN4: ZERO(LAW) |
2013-03-01 | House | FN3: ZERO(CED) |
2013-03-01 | House | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-03-01 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-03-01 | House | DP: MILLETT, GRUENBERG, PRUITT, LYNN, LEDOUX, KELLER |
2013-03-01 | House | JUD RPT 6DP |
2013-01-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG |
2013-01-16 | House | JUD |
2013-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-01-16 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13 |