AK HB326 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making supplemental appropriations and other appropriations; amending appropriations; repealing appropriations; making appropriations to capitalize funds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Supplemental/other Appropriations
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/8 CHAPTER 13 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 10:51 AM 4/29/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: CSHB 326(FIN) | |
2010-04-18 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-18 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y19 N1 | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 326(FIN) | |
2010-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-18 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS, OLSON | |
2010-04-18 | FIN RPT 7DP | |
2010-04-18 | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR | |
2010-04-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | FIN | |
2010-03-30 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-29 | VERSION: CSHB 326(FIN) | |
2010-03-29 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-03-29 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-03-29 | PASSED Y40 | |
2010-03-29 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 326(FIN) | |
2010-03-29 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-29 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-29 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-29 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2010 | |
2010-03-29 | FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE, HAWKER | |
2010-03-29 | DP: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, KELLY, AUSTERMAN, SALMON, N.FOSTER, | |
2010-03-29 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 11DP | |
2010-02-03 | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER | |
2010-02-03 | FIN | |
2010-02-03 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Airports
Appropriations
Attorney General
Budget
Collective Bargaining
Corrections
Courts
Disabilities
Education
Elections
Environmental Concerns
Fire Protection
Fish & Game (both)
Foster Care
Funds
Health & Social Services
Highways
Insurance
Labor
Law Enforcement
Marine Highway
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Oil & Gas
Pipelines
Public Assistance
Public Employees
Public Safety
Resources
Retirement
Revenue
Schools
Senior Citizens
Supplemental Appropriations
Transportation
Veterans
Vocational Training
Appropriations
Attorney General
Budget
Collective Bargaining
Corrections
Courts
Disabilities
Education
Elections
Environmental Concerns
Fire Protection
Fish & Game (both)
Foster Care
Funds
Health & Social Services
Highways
Insurance
Labor
Law Enforcement
Marine Highway
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Oil & Gas
Pipelines
Public Assistance
Public Employees
Public Safety
Resources
Retirement
Revenue
Schools
Senior Citizens
Supplemental Appropriations
Transportation
Veterans
Vocational Training