AK HB309 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 4/17/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the procedure for confirmation of the governor's appointments; relating to the board of the Mental Health Trust Authority; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confirmation Of Appointments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-26 - House - House: Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-24 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 1 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31HouseDUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 4/17/20
2020-03-31House4:45 P.M. 3/31/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2020-03-26HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2020-03-26HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 E4 A1
2020-03-26HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2020-03-25HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2020-03-25SenateVERSION: SCS HB 309(RLS)
2020-03-25SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2020-03-25SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2020-03-25SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2020-03-25SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 309(RLS)
2020-03-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2020-03-25SenateRLS SCS ADOPTED UC
2020-03-25SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-03-25SenateRULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 3/25/2020
2020-03-25SenateFN1: ZERO(H.RLS)
2020-03-25SenateDP: COGHILL, BEGICH, GIESSEL
2020-03-25SenateRLS RPT SCS 3DP SAME TITLE
2020-03-25SenateRLS WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
2020-03-25SenateRLS
2020-03-25SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2020-03-24HouseVERSION: HB 309 AM
2020-03-24HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2020-03-24HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2020-03-24HousePASSED Y34 N1 E3 A2
2020-03-24HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 309 AM
2020-03-24HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2020-03-24 2053
2020-03-24House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2020-03-24 2053
2020-03-24HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-03-23HouseHELD TO 3/24 CALENDAR
2020-03-21HouseHELD TO 3/23 CALENDAR
2020-03-21HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2020
2020-03-21HouseFN1: ZERO(H.RLS)
2020-03-21HouseNR: JOHNSON, PRUITT
2020-03-21HouseDP: THOMPSON, JOHNSTON, STUTES, KOPP
2020-03-21HouseRLS RPT 4DP 2NR
2020-03-20HouseRLS WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 UC
2020-03-20HouseRLS
2020-03-20HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback