AK HB307 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/9/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/9/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the financing and issuance of bonds for a liquefied natural gas production system and natural gas distribution system; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend Bond Auth For Interior Energy Proj
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-08 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/9/22 |
2022-07-08 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/8 CHAPTER 34 SLA 22 |
2022-07-07 | House | 11:15 A.M. 7/7/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-17 | Senate | VERSION: HB 307 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-05-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, BISHOP, STEDMAN, MYERS, REVAK |
2022-05-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 307 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CAL |
2022-05-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2022-05-12 | Senate | NR: WILSON |
2022-05-12 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, OLSON, VON IMHOF |
2022-05-12 | Senate | FIN RPT 4DP 1NR |
2022-04-29 | Senate | FIN |
2022-04-29 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-04-27 | House | VERSION: HB 307 |
2022-04-27 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-04-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2022-04-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-04-27 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2022-04-27 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 307 |
2022-04-27 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-04-27 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-27 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WOOL |
2022-04-25 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2022-04-25 | House | NR: ORTIZ |
2022-04-25 | House | DP: EDGMON, CARPENTER, THOMPSON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, MERRICK, FOSTER |
2022-04-25 | House | FIN RPT 7DP 1NR |
2022-03-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEBON, THOMPSON |
2022-03-02 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2022-03-02 | House | NR: KAUFMAN, NELSON, SNYDER |
2022-03-02 | House | DP: SCHRAGE, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ |
2022-03-02 | House | L&C RPT 3DP 3NR |
2022-02-04 | House | L&C, FIN |
2022-02-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |