AK HB3 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to specie as legal tender in the state; and relating to borough and city sales and use taxes on specie.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gold And Silver Specie As Legal Tender

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-12SenateREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2023-05-12SenateSTA, FIN
2023-05-12SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2023-05-11HouseVERSION: CSHB 3(FIN)
2023-05-11HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2023-05-11HouseCOSPONSOR(S): RUFFRIDGE
2023-05-11HousePASSED Y25 N15
2023-05-11HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 3(FIN)
2023-05-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TILTON, PATKOTAK
2023-05-10HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/11 CALENDAR
2023-05-10HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y2 N37 A1
2023-05-10HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N32 A1
2023-05-10HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2023-05-10HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2023-05-10HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2023
2023-05-08HouseFN2: ZERO(CED)
2023-05-08HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2023-05-08HouseAM: GALVIN, HANNAN
2023-05-08HouseNR: JOSEPHSON
2023-05-08HouseDP: CRONK, ORTIZ, STAPP, EDGMON, D.JOHNSON, FOSTER
2023-05-08HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) 6DP 1NR 2AM
2023-04-17HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SHAW
2023-04-12HouseSTUTES, C.JOHNSON, SUMNER, FOSTER, STAPP, COULOMBE
2023-04-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): CRONK, TOMASZEWSKI, CARPENTER, MCKAY, VANCE, ALLARD, WRIGHT, PRAX,
2023-02-22HouseFN2: ZERO(CED)
2023-02-22HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2023-02-22HouseNR: ARMSTRONG, STORY
2023-02-22HouseDP: ALLARD, C.JOHNSON, CARPENTER, SHAW
2023-02-22HouseSTA RPT 4DP 2NR
2023-01-25HouseCRA REFERRAL REMOVED
2023-01-19HouseCRA, STA, FIN
2023-01-19HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2023-01-19HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback