AK HB285 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations for the operating and capital expenses of the state's integrated comprehensive mental health program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Approp: Mental Health Budget
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/12 | |
2012-05-15 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/14 CHAPTER 16 SLA 12 | |
2012-05-03 | 1:51 PM 5/3/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-04-30 | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/26/12 | |
2012-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-15 | CC RPT ADPTD Y20 N- CCS HB 285 | |
2012-04-15 | TAKEN UP | |
2012-04-15 | FISCAL NOTE PACKET | |
2012-04-15 | CC REPORT READ AND HELD | |
2012-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-15 | CC RPT ADPTD Y38 A1 V1 CCS HB 285 | |
2012-04-15 | FISCAL NOTE PACKET | |
2012-04-15 | CC REPORT: CCS HB 285 | |
2012-04-09 | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED | |
2012-04-07 | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED | |
2012-04-06 | HOFFMAN (CHAIR), STEDMAN, THOMAS | |
2012-04-06 | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED | |
2012-04-06 | FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N20 | |
2012-04-05 | THOMAS (CHAIR), STOLTZE, GARA | |
2012-04-05 | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED | |
2012-04-05 | FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N37 E3 | |
2012-04-05 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2012-04-04 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 285(FIN) | |
2012-04-04 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2012-04-04 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-04 | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N- | |
2012-04-04 | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-04 | MEYER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2012-04-04 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-04 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2012-04-04 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 285(FIN) | |
2012-04-04 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-04 | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-04 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-04 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2012 | |
2012-04-02 | DP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, OLSON, ELLIS | |
2012-04-02 | FIN RPT SCS 6DP SAME TITLE | |
2012-03-16 | FIN | |
2012-03-16 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-03-15 | VERSION: CSHB 285(FIN) | |
2012-03-15 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2012-03-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-03-15 | PASSED Y36 E3 A1 | |
2012-03-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 285(FIN) | |
2012-03-14 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/15 CALENDAR | |
2012-03-14 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-14 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-03-14 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/14/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2012-03-14 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GARA, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, COSTELLO, NEUMAN, EDGMON, | |
2012-03-14 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 11DP | |
2012-01-17 | OMB ATTACHMENT PER AS 37.14.003 | |
2012-01-17 | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER | |
2012-01-17 | FIN | |
2012-01-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alcohol
Appropriations
Budget
Disabilities
Drugs
Foster Care
Grants
Health & Social Services
Labor Relations
Medical Care
Mental Health
Pioneers' Homes
Public Assistance
Public Employees
Salaries & Allowances
Senior Citizens
Appropriations
Budget
Disabilities
Drugs
Foster Care
Grants
Health & Social Services
Labor Relations
Medical Care
Mental Health
Pioneers' Homes
Public Assistance
Public Employees
Salaries & Allowances
Senior Citizens