AK HB280 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-25 - COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-25 - COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to new defined benefit tiers in the public employees' retirement system and the teachers' retirement system; providing certain employees an opportunity to choose between the defined benefit and defined contribution plans of the public employees' retirement system and the teachers' retirement system; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Teachers & Pub Employee Retirement Plans
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kito [D] | Rep. Cathy Munoz [R] | Rep. Robert Lynn [R] | Rep. Louise Stutes [R] |
Rep. Gabrielle LeDoux [R] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2016-03-25 | House | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE |
2016-03-25 | House | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2016-03-25 | House | NR: VAZQUEZ, TALERICO, STUTES |
2016-03-25 | House | DNP: KELLER |
2016-03-25 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, SPOHNHOLZ, LYNN |
2016-03-25 | House | STA RPT 3DP 1DNP 3NR |
2016-02-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2016-02-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STUTES, LEDOUX |
2016-01-29 | House | STA, L&C, FIN |
2016-01-29 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=29&bill=HB280 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0280A.PDF |