AK HB273 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/26/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/26/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to general grant land entitlements for the City and Borough of Wrangell and for the Haines Borough; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Municipal General Grant Land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/26/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 104 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:35 PM 6/14/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-13 | VERSION: CSHB 273(FIN) | |
2010-04-13 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-13 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-13 | PASSED Y18 N- A2 | |
2010-04-13 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 273(FIN) | |
2010-04-13 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-13 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-13 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | FN1: ZERO(DNR) | |
2010-04-07 | NR: OLSON | |
2010-04-07 | DP: THOMAS, KOOKESH, MENARD | |
2010-04-07 | CRA RPT 3DP 1NR | |
2010-03-25 | CRA | |
2010-03-25 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-24 | VERSION: CSHB 273(FIN) | |
2010-03-24 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-03-24 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-03-24 | PASSED Y38 E2 | |
2010-03-24 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 273(FIN) | |
2010-03-24 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-24 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-24 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-24 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-19 | COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS | |
2010-03-19 | FN1: ZERO(DNR) | |
2010-03-19 | NR: GARA, DOOGAN, KELLY | |
2010-03-19 | DP: THOMAS, AUSTERMAN, JOULE, N.FOSTER, FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE | |
2010-03-19 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 3NR | |
2010-02-26 | FN1: ZERO(DNR) | |
2010-02-26 | NR: HERRON | |
2010-02-26 | DP: GARDNER, KELLER, HARRIS, CISSNA, MUNOZ | |
2010-02-26 | CRA RPT CS(CRA) 5DP 1NR | |
2010-01-19 | CRA, FIN | |
2010-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-01-19 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/10 |