AK HB262 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/30/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/30/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the month of May as Motorcycle and Motor Scooter Awareness Month.
Title
Motorcycle/scooter Awareness Month
Sponsors
Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Rep. Max Gruenberg [D] | Rep. David Guttenberg [D] | Rep. Bob Herron [D] |
Rep. Kyle Johansen [R] | Rep. Wes Keller [R] | Rep. Robert Lynn [R] | Rep. James Petersen [D] |
Rep. Jay Ramras [R] | Rep. Paul Seaton [R] | Sen. Bill Stoltze [R] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] |
Rep. Peggy Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/30/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/1 CHAPTER 9 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 3:54 PM 4/28/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-07 | VERSION: CSHB 262(TRA) | |
2010-04-07 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-07 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-07 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 262(TRA) | |
2010-04-07 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-07 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-07 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2010 | |
2010-04-02 | FN1: ZERO(DOT) | |
2010-04-02 | DP: KOOKESH, MENARD, DAVIS, MEYER, PASKVAN | |
2010-04-02 | TRA RPT 5DP | |
2010-03-24 | TRA | |
2010-03-24 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-23 | VERSION: CSHB 262(TRA) | |
2010-03-23 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-03-23 | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, P.WILSON, GARA, JOHANSEN, GUTTENBERG | |
2010-03-23 | PASSED Y37 E2 A1 | |
2010-03-23 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 262(TRA) | |
2010-03-23 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-23 | TRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-23 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-23 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/23/2010 | |
2010-03-19 | COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG | |
2010-03-19 | FN1: ZERO(DOT) | |
2010-03-19 | DP: JOHANSEN, MUNOZ, T.WILSON, GRUENBERG, PETERSEN, P.WILSON | |
2010-03-19 | TRA RPT CS(TRA) NT 6DP | |
2010-01-19 | TRA | |
2010-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-01-19 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/10 |