AK HB257 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring the Department of Natural Resources to make Cook Inlet seismic survey data available to certain persons; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Cook Inlet Seismic Data
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-04-26 | House | FN1: (DNR) |
2024-04-26 | House | AM: HANNAN, JOSEPHSON |
2024-04-26 | House | DP: STAPP, GALVIN, COULOMBE, ORTIZ, TOMASZEWSKI, CRONK, D.JOHNSON, FOSTER |
2024-04-26 | House | FIN RPT 8DP 2AM |
2024-02-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER |
2024-02-14 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES |
2024-02-14 | House | FN1: (DNR) |
2024-02-14 | House | NR: ARMSTRONG, DIBERT |
2024-02-14 | House | DNP: MEARS |
2024-02-14 | House | DP: MCCABE, SADDLER, WRIGHT, BAKER, RAUSCHER, MCKAY |
2024-02-14 | House | RES RPT 6DP 1DNP 2NR |
2024-01-16 | House | RES |
2024-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-01-16 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/12/24 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB257 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0257A.PDF |