AK HB251 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act exempting certain foods and drinks prepared in a person's uninspected home kitchen from state labeling, licensing, packaging, permitting, and inspection requirements; and permitting a person to acquire meat from a producer by way of an ownership share in an animal if certain conditions are met.
Title
Exemptions For Homemade Foods
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-04-18 | House | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2024-04-18 | House | DP: MEARS, ARMSTRONG, DIBERT, MCCABE, SADDLER, WRIGHT, BAKER, RAUSCHER, MCKAY |
2024-04-18 | House | RES RPT CS(L&C) NEW TITLE 9DP |
2024-03-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2024-03-28 | House | NR: CARRICK, FIELDS, SADDLER, PRAX, WRIGHT |
2024-03-28 | House | DP: RUFFRIDGE, SUMNER |
2024-03-28 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NEW TITLE 2DP 5NR |
2024-02-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ARMSTRONG |
2024-02-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT |
2024-01-16 | House | L&C, RES |
2024-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-01-16 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/12/24 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB251 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0251A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0251B.PDF |